NY A07922 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the rights of parties involved in foreclosure actions; allows the mortgagee, or mortgagor and borrower to recover attorney fees; makes conforming technical changes.
Title
Relates to the rights of parties involved in foreclosure actions; allows the mortgagee, or mortgagor and borrower to recover attorney fees; makes conforming technical changes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | print number 7922a |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05473 (Same As) 2022-05-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7737B