NY S05435 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-29 - PRINT NUMBER 5435B
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-29 - PRINT NUMBER 5435B
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the practice of certified registered nurse anesthetist; requires collaboration with a licensed physician qualified to determine the need for anesthesia services; requires licensing; defines qualifications.
Title
Defines the practice of certified registered nurse anesthetist; requires collaboration with a licensed physician qualified to determine the need for anesthesia services; requires licensing; defines qualifications.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Cooney [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5435B |
2022-04-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2021-05-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5435A |
2021-05-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2021-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07268 (Same As) 2022-05-06 - print number 7268a