US HB7240 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To achieve a fair, equitable, and final settlement of claims to water rights in the State of Montana for the Fort Belknap Indian Community of the Fort Belknap Reservation of Montana, and for other purposes.
Title
Fort Belknap Indian Community Water Rights Settlement Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2024-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5088 (Related) 2023-07-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
SB1987 (Related) 2023-07-19 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
SB1987 (Related) 2023-07-19 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7240/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7240/BILLS-118hr7240ih.pdf |