US SB1987 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for the settlement of the water rights claims of the Fort Belknap Indian Community, and for other purposes.
Title
Fort Belknap Indian Community Water Rights Settlement Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-19 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
HB5088 (Same As) 2023-07-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB7240 (Related) 2024-02-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
HB5088 (Same As) 2023-07-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB7240 (Related) 2024-02-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/1987/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s1987/BILLS-118s1987is.pdf |