CO HB1028 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authorization for a municipality to allow for the operation of an overdose prevention center within its jurisdiction.
Title
Overdose Prevention Centers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Postpone House Bill 24-1028 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1028 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.007) (Y: 21 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.006) (Y: 24 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.005) (Y: 22 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.004) (Y: 29 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.003) (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.002) (Y: 22 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1028 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1028 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.007) (Y: 21 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.006) (Y: 24 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.005) (Y: 22 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.004) (Y: 29 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.003) (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.002) (Y: 22 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1028 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-06 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |