NY A07268 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-06 - print number 7268a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-06 - print number 7268a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the practice of certified registered nurse anesthetist; requires collaboration with a licensed physician qualified to determine the need for anesthesia services; requires licensing; defines qualifications.
Title
Defines the practice of certified registered nurse anesthetist; requires collaboration with a licensed physician qualified to determine the need for anesthesia services; requires licensing; defines qualifications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 7268a |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05435 (Same As) 2022-04-29 - PRINT NUMBER 5435B