CA SB1108 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 18420 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to mobilehome parks.
Title
Mobilehome parks: notice of violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1108 Ochoa Bogh Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1108 Ochoa Bogh Senate Third Reading By Wallis (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB1108 Ochoa Bogh (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1108 Ochoa Bogh Senate Third Reading By Wallis (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB1108 Ochoa Bogh (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-22 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2024-09-22 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2024-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2024-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5786.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6970.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4179.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3972.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | April 22 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3531.) (April 9). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3350.) (March 19). |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 19. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 18420 | New Code | See Bill Text |