NY S05240 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7622B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7622B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the liquor authority to issue temporary permits for certain events and under certain circumstances.
Title
Authorizes the liquor authority to issue temporary permits for certain events and under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7622B |
2012-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1194 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-05-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5240B |
2012-05-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5240A |
2011-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2011-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07622 (Same As) 2012-07-18 - signed chap.120