NY S05181 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - SIGNED CHAP.74
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - SIGNED CHAP.74
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing hunting in the county of Wayne.
Title
Relates to authorizing hunting in the county of Wayne.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.74 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.387 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a7357b |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1557 |
2015-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5181B |
2015-06-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2015-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5181A |
2015-06-03 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2015-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07357 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - substituted by s5181b