NY S04943 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.153
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.153
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the metropolitan transportation authority, in consultation with the Long Island Rail Road Commuter's Council, the Metro-North Rail Commuter's Council and the New York City Transit Authority Advisory Council to develop a strategic action plan to improve bicycle and pedestrian access at its bridges and passenger stations.
Title
Requires the metropolitan transportation authority, in consultation with the Long Island Rail Road Commuter's Council, the Metro-North Rail Commuter's Council and the New York City Transit Authority Advisory Council to develop a strategic action plan to improve bicycle and pedestrian access at its bridges and passenger stations.
Sponsors
Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Michael Gianaris [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-28 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.153 |
2021-12-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.802 |
2021-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.715 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a6235b |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4943B |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1239 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4943A |
2021-05-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-02-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06235 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s4943b