NY S04824 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-12 - DEFEATED IN CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-12 - DEFEATED IN CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the boundaries of the Niagara river greenway.
Title
Defines the boundaries of the Niagara river greenway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | DEFEATED IN CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2016-02-26 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2016-01-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4824A |
2016-01-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2015-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00478 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development