NY S04786 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that absentee ballots for all elections shall be made available in Braille and large print, upon request of a blind or visually impaired voter no less than 30 days prior to each election day.
Title
Provides that absentee ballots for all elections shall be made available in Braille and large print, upon request of a blind or visually impaired voter no less than 30 days prior to each election day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.683 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04961 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.354