NY A04961 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.354
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.354
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that absentee ballots for all elections shall be made available in Braille and large print, upon request of a blind or visually impaired voter no less than 30 days prior to each election day.
Title
Provides that absentee ballots for all elections shall be made available in Braille and large print, upon request of a blind or visually impaired voter no less than 30 days prior to each election day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.354 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.419 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | print number 4961b |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | print number 4961a |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S04786 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
S08775 (Same As) 2018-05-16 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
S08775 (Same As) 2018-05-16 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS