NY S04689 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the legislature to settle the land dispute between the state and private parties in township 40, Totten and Crossfield Purchase in the town of Long Lake, county of Hamilton, such lands being in the state forest preserve (second passage).
Title
Authorizes the legislature to settle the land dispute between the state and private parties in township 40, Totten and Crossfield Purchase in the town of Long Lake, county of Hamilton, such lands being in the state forest preserve (second passage).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.474 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7684 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2013-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1283 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-05-06 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-04-19 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2013-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07684 (Same As) 2013-06-19 - substituted by s4689