NY S04521 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - PRINT NUMBER 4521A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - PRINT NUMBER 4521A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the earnings limitations for retired police officers employed as school resource officers; $65,000 for the year 2020 and thereafter.
Title
Relates to the earnings limitations for retired police officers employed as school resource officers; $65,000 for the year 2020 and thereafter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4521A |
2020-06-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.730 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07849 (Same As) 2020-07-10 - print number 7849a