NY A07849 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-10 - print number 7849a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-10 - print number 7849a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the earnings limitations for retired police officers employed as school resource officers; $65,000 for the year 2020 and thereafter.
Title
Relates to the earnings limitations for retired police officers employed as school resource officers; $65,000 for the year 2020 and thereafter.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] | Asm. John Mikulin [R] | Asm. Steve Stern [D] |
Asm. David McDonough [R] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | Assembly | print number 7849a |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04521 (Same As) 2020-06-08 - PRINT NUMBER 4521A