NY S04266 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.58
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.58
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force on missing women and girls who are black, indigenous and people of color (BIPOC) to develop policy changes that will work to address the lack of care and concern for missing and murdered BIPOC women and girls with New York state governmental agencies.
Title
Establishes a task force on missing women and girls who are black, indigenous and people of color (BIPOC) to develop policy changes that will work to address the lack of care and concern for missing and murdered BIPOC women and girls with New York state governmental agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-21 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.58 |
2023-12-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.732 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.349 |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | substituted for a5088a |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-03-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-21 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4266A |
2023-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.506 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
Same As/Similar To
A05088 (Same As) 2023-05-31 - substituted by s4266a