NY S04084 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.312
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to collect discarded recyclable materials at parks, historic sites and recreational facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to collect discarded recyclable materials at parks, historic sites and recreational facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-13AssemblySIGNED CHAP.312
2017-09-01SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.529
2017-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a2858b
2017-06-07Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-05-23SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4084A
2017-03-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-03-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-03-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.353
2017-02-03SenateREFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION

Same As/Similar To

A02858 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s4084a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback