NY A02858 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s4084a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s4084a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to collect discarded recyclable materials at parks, historic sites and recreational facilities.
Title
Requires the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to collect discarded recyclable materials at parks, historic sites and recreational facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4084a |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.529 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | print number 2858b |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | print number 2858a |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S04084 (Same As) 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.312