NY S03567 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A834B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A834B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the president of the civil service commission to study and publish a report on nurse practitioners.
Title
Directs the president of the civil service commission to study and publish a report on nurse practitioners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A834B |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3567B |
2017-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3567A |
2017-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.436 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00834 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - approval memo.14