NY A00834 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - approval memo.14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the president of the civil service commission to study and publish a report on nurse practitioners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the president of the civil service commission to study and publish a report on nurse practitioners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29Senateapproval memo.14
2017-11-29Senatesigned chap.409
2017-11-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-13SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-13Senate3RD READING CAL.436
2017-06-13SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3567B
2017-06-08SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-08Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-08Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.81
2017-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.81
2017-06-07Assemblyreported
2017-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-01Assemblyprint number 834b
2017-06-01Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental employees
2017-05-23Assemblyprint number 834a
2017-05-23Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to governmental employees
2017-01-09Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S03567 (Same As) 2017-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A834B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00834&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00834&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00834
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00834&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00834A
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00834&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00834B
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00834&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00834&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00834&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A834#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback