CA SB1003 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-31 - Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 7099.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8557, 15472, 15473, 15475, 15475.1, 15475.2, and 15475.6 of, and to repeal Sections 15475.4 and 15475.5 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 326.1, 326.2, 451.1, 8385, 8386, 8386.1, 8386.2, 8386.3, 8386.4, 8386.5, 8387, 8388.5, and 8389 of, and to repeal Section 326 of, the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Section 351 of the Water Code, relating to electricity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electricity: wildfire mitigation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1003 Dodd (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 7099.)
2024-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2024-08-29AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2024-08-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2024-08-29AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2024-08-29AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2024-08-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended.
2024-08-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2024-08-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
2024-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-08-19AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2024-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15).
2024-08-07AssemblyAugust 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2024-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2024-06-17AssemblyJune 19 hearing postponed by committee.
2024-06-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2024-05-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2024-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2024-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4024.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2024-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3967.) (May 16).
2024-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2024-04-15SenateApril 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2024-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 15.
2024-04-04SenateApril 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2024-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 8.
2024-03-21SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-03-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0. Page 3349.) (March 19).
2024-03-07SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2024-03-06SenateSet for hearing March 19.
2024-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2024-02-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
2024-02-01SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code15472Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code15473Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code15475Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code15475.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code15475.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code15475.4Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code15475.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code15475.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8557Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code326Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code326.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code326.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code451.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8385Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8386Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8386.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8386.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8386.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8386.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8386.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8387Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8388.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8389Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code351Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1003
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1003#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1003#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1003#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1003#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1003#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1003#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1003#93AMD
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1003

Bill Comments

feedback