NY S03489 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2756A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2756A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Islip, county of Suffolk, to accept an application for exemption from real property taxes from the East Islip Fire District with respect to a portion of the 2021-2022 assessment roll and the entire 2022-2023 assessment roll.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Islip, county of Suffolk, to accept an application for exemption from real property taxes from the East Islip Fire District with respect to a portion of the 2021-2022 assessment roll and the entire 2022-2023 assessment roll.
Sponsors
Sen. Alexis Weik [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2756A |
2023-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.554 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3489A |
2023-03-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02756 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - signed chap.378