NY S03292 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6848A
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6848A
Summary
Permits pharmacists that practice in licensed health care facilities to engage in collaborative management of drug therapy to reduce potential medication errors and adverse reactions pursuant to voluntary agreements or protocols with physicians and patients.
Title
Permits pharmacists that practice in licensed health care facilities to engage in collaborative management of drug therapy to reduce potential medication errors and adverse reactions pursuant to voluntary agreements or protocols with physicians and patients.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | SUBSTITUTED BY A6848A | |
2010-06-21 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3292A | |
2010-06-21 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-06-21 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-21 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | |
2010-02-22 | referred to higher education | |
2010-02-22 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-02-22 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-02-09 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-02-08 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-02-02 | 1ST REPORT CAL.68 | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION | |
2010-01-06 | returned to senate | |
2010-01-06 | died in assembly | |
2009-09-11 | referred to higher education | |
2009-09-10 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-09-10 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-09-10 | RESTORED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-05-27 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-26 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-20 | 1ST REPORT CAL.425 | |
2009-03-13 | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06848 (Same As) 2010-06-29 - 3RD READING CAL.68
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03292&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |