NY S03253 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-18 - PRINT NUMBER 3253A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-18 - PRINT NUMBER 3253A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions relating to the information which must be included on applications for absentee ballots for school district elections: removes requirement for certain detailed statements/information regarding special circumstances concerning duties, occupation, business or studies requiring absence, and regarding absence due to vacation.
Title
Amends provisions relating to the information which must be included on applications for absentee ballots for school district elections: removes requirement for certain detailed statements/information regarding special circumstances concerning duties, occupation, business or studies requiring absence, and regarding absence due to vacation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | PRINT NUMBER 3253A | |
2010-05-18 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | |
2009-03-13 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A4315 (Same As) 2010-06-16 - held for consideration in education