NY A04315 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-13)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-16 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

To simplify the application for an absentee ballot in the Education law so that the application process is less burdensome and intrusive on the voter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends provisions relating to the information which must be included on applications for absentee ballots for school district elections: removes requirement for certain detailed statements/information regarding special circumstances concerning duties, occupation, business or studies requiring absence, and regarding absence due to vacation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-16 held for consideration in education
2010-05-17 print number 4315a
2010-05-17 amend and recommit to education
2010-01-06 referred to education
2009-02-03 referred to education

Same As/Similar To

S3253 (Same As) 2010-05-18 - PRINT NUMBER 3253A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback