NY S03160 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.133
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.133
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York city transit authority advisory council to investigate, report and make recommendations on instructing the public on how to react when an individual falls onto authority facility tracks.
Title
Requires the New York city transit authority advisory council to investigate, report and make recommendations on instructing the public on how to react when an individual falls onto authority facility tracks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.133 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.776 |
2021-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.3 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a935a |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1529 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3160A |
2021-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00935 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s3160a