NY S03114 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the use of common areas in housing authority projects by tenant groups, committees or organizations without the imposition of a fee providing that the meeting is peacefully conducted, during reasonable hours, does not obstruct any access, and the meeting space is reserved three days in advance.
Title
Provides for the use of common areas in housing authority projects by tenant groups, committees or organizations without the imposition of a fee providing that the meeting is peacefully conducted, during reasonable hours, does not obstruct any access, and the meeting space is reserved three days in advance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A570 |
2011-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.195 |
2011-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A00570 (Same As) 2012-03-08 - advanced to third reading cal.384