NY S02840 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3556A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3556A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to giving the state soil and water conservation committee membership to the New York ocean and Great Lakes ecosystem conservation council.
Title
Relates to giving the state soil and water conservation committee membership to the New York ocean and Great Lakes ecosystem conservation council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3556A |
2011-06-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2840A |
2011-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-04-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-04-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.341 |
2011-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03556 (Same As) 2011-08-03 - signed chap.363