NY S02779 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the lapse of oil and gas and interests located within Allegany state park if unused for 20 years prior to effective date of act unless a statement of claim is filed by the owner prior to the end of the 20 year period or within 2 years of the effective date of the act, whichever is later; provides upon such lapse ownership shall revert to New York state; procedures and definitions.
Title
Provides for the lapse of oil and gas and interests located within Allegany state park if unused for 20 years prior to effective date of act unless a statement of claim is filed by the owner prior to the end of the 20 year period or within 2 years of the effective date of the act, whichever is later; provides upon such lapse ownership shall revert to New York state; procedures and definitions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A408 |
2011-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.908 |
2011-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00408 (Same As) 2011-09-23 - signed chap.501