NY S02705 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to resource exemptions for applicants for public assistance programs; amends the Welfare Reform Act in relation to the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to resource exemptions for applicants for public assistance programs; amends the Welfare Reform Act in relation to the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-02-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2705B |
2024-02-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2023-05-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2705A |
2023-05-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A05689 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means