NY S02542 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.180
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.180
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the examination of tinted or shaded windows in the periodic inspection of motor vehicles required by law; authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to promulgate any and all rules and regulations necessary.
Title
Includes the examination of tinted or shaded windows in the periodic inspection of motor vehicles required by law; authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to promulgate any and all rules and regulations necessary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.180 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.538 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a7351 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.172 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2011-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1053 |
2011-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07351 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s2542