NY S02251 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.267
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.267
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Elevates assault of a utility worker in the second degree to a class D felony; includes an employee of an entity governed by the public service law within such provisions.
Title
Elevates assault of a utility worker in the second degree to a class D felony; includes an employee of an entity governed by the public service law within such provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] |
Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.267 |
2016-08-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.517 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a4738a |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.475 |
2016-01-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2251A |
2016-01-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1348 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04738 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - substituted by s2251a