NY S02168 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-18 - PRINT NUMBER 2168A
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-18 - PRINT NUMBER 2168A
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "childcare and early education sector on the economy act" to study the economic impact on the state economy of quality childcare and early education programs for children aged 0-4, and afterschool programs for children aged 5-12.
Title
Establishes the "childcare and early education sector on the economy act" to study the economic impact on the state economy of quality childcare and early education programs for children aged 0-4, and afterschool programs for children aged 5-12.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Adams [D] | Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] | Sen. George Onorato [D] |
Sen. Suzi Oppenheimer [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Bill Perkins [D] | Sen. John Sampson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | PRINT NUMBER 2168A | |
2010-03-18 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | |
2009-02-12 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A10133 (Same As) 2010-05-18 - held for consideration in economic development