NY S02158 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1353A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1353A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that enrolled members of Southampton Village Ocean Rescue shall be eligible for the tax exemption on real property authorized by section 466-c of the real property tax law.
Title
Provides that enrolled members of Southampton Village Ocean Rescue shall be eligible for the tax exemption on real property authorized by section 466-c of the real property tax law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1353A |
2024-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1560 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2158A |
2024-05-29 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01353 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY