NY S01858 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes summer camps to hire licensed social workers, physical therapists, psychologists, athletic trainers, mental health care professionals, occupational therapists and other licensed professionals to provide services.
Title
Authorizes summer camps to hire licensed social workers, physical therapists, psychologists, athletic trainers, mental health care professionals, occupational therapists and other licensed professionals to provide services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1482 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1858B |
2018-04-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2115 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1858A |
2017-05-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-05-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A03088 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in higher education