NY S01839 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2609A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2609A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the health equity council to advise the commissioner regarding sickle cell disease.
Title
Directs the health equity council to advise the commissioner regarding sickle cell disease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2609A |
2023-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1839A |
2023-05-23 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-05-23 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-03-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.520 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02609 (Same As) 2023-12-08 - signed chap.684