NY S01185 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the extended producer responsibility act requiring covered materials and product producers to develop and implement strategies to promote recycling, reuse and recovery of packaging and paper products.
Title
Establishes the extended producer responsibility act requiring covered materials and product producers to develop and implement strategies to promote recycling, reuse and recovery of packaging and paper products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-19 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1185C |
2021-03-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1185B |
2021-02-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.240 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1185A |
2021-01-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |