NY S00762 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - PRINT NUMBER 762B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - PRINT NUMBER 762B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a tax exemption from sales and compensating use taxes on alternative energy systems including alternative energy systems, new Energy Star appliances and tangible personal property used in or on habitable residential and non-residential structures to improve energy efficiency; and defines relevant terms; authorizes municipalities to adopt the exemption.
Title
Provides a tax exemption from sales and compensating use taxes on alternative energy systems including alternative energy systems, new Energy Star appliances and tangible personal property used in or on habitable residential and non-residential structures to improve energy efficiency; and defines relevant terms; authorizes municipalities to adopt the exemption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 762B |
2016-01-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-02-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 762A |
2015-02-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05780 (Same As) 2016-04-25 - print number 5780a