NY S00625 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the allocation of funds under the supportive housing development program.
Title
Relates to the allocation of funds under the supportive housing development program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
2016-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1602 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-04-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-04-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.252 |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A03621 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to health