NY S00282 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6769
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6769
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an individual who was an eligible youth who was not determined to be a youthful offender by the sentencing court may apply to such court for a new determination after at least five years have passed since the imposition of the sentence, or at least five years after the individual's latest release from incarceration, if such individual was sentenced to a period of incarceration.
Title
Provides that an individual who was an eligible youth who was not determined to be a youthful offender by the sentencing court may apply to such court for a new determination after at least five years have passed since the imposition of the sentence, or at least five years after the individual's latest release from incarceration, if such individual was sentenced to a period of incarceration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6769 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1213 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06769 (Same As) 2021-11-02 - signed chap.552