NY A06769 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - signed chap.552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - signed chap.552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an individual who was an eligible youth who was not determined to be a youthful offender by the sentencing court may apply to such court for a new determination after at least five years have passed since the imposition of the sentence, or at least five years after the individual's latest release from incarceration, if such individual was sentenced to a period of incarceration.
Title
Provides that an individual who was an eligible youth who was not determined to be a youthful offender by the sentencing court may apply to such court for a new determination after at least five years have passed since the imposition of the sentence, or at least five years after the individual's latest release from incarceration, if such individual was sentenced to a period of incarceration.
Sponsors
Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] | Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] |
Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D] | Asm. Chantel Jackson [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-02 | Assembly | signed chap.552 |
2021-10-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1213 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S282 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.356 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.356 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00282 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6769