NY S00263 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a process for regulating the collecting, recording, and disclosing of confidential information by state employees; defines "confidential information".
Title
Establishes a process for regulating the collecting, recording, and disclosing of confidential information by state employees; defines "confidential information".
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2011-03-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2011-02-22 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |