NY S00250 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6990B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6990B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "veterinary emergency response and mobility act of 2015".
Title
Enacts the "veterinary emergency response and mobility act of 2015".
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. George Latimer [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Bill Perkins [D] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6990B |
2015-06-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 250B |
2015-05-27 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 250A |
2015-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-04-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.410 |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06990 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - signed chap.444