NY A06990 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - signed chap.444
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - signed chap.444
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "veterinary emergency response and mobility act of 2015".
Title
Enacts the "veterinary emergency response and mobility act of 2015".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.444 |
2015-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S250B |
2015-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.263 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.263 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 6990b |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | print number 6990a |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S00250 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6990B