NY S00143 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 143A
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 143A
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a financial exploitation prevention outreach, education and training program and fund; authorizes the director of the office of the aging to award grants to qualified agencies to establish local elderly exploitation, outreach, education and training programs; outlines elements of such program.
Title
Provides for a financial exploitation prevention outreach, education and training program and fund; authorizes the director of the office of the aging to award grants to qualified agencies to establish local elderly exploitation, outreach, education and training programs; outlines elements of such program.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. John Sampson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 143A |
2014-01-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGING |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2013-04-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A04655 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - print number 4655a