NY A10565 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s8644a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s8644a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that a person hold a license, tag or privilege in an electronic or other acceptable format pursuant to regulations for the hunting of deer and bears.
Title
Requires that a person hold a license, tag or privilege in an electronic or other acceptable format pursuant to regulations for the hunting of deer and bears.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s8644a |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.588 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08644 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.158