NY S08644 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.158
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.158
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that a person hold a license, tag or privilege in an electronic or other acceptable format pursuant to regulations for the hunting of deer and bears.
Title
Requires that a person hold a license, tag or privilege in an electronic or other acceptable format pursuant to regulations for the hunting of deer and bears.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.158 |
2024-06-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.588 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a10565 |
2024-05-29 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2024-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-14 | Senate | AMENDED 8644A |
2024-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.645 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10565 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - substituted by s8644a