NY A10238 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.331
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.331
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the provisions relating to fees and expenses in unemployment insurance proceedings.
Title
Extends the provisions relating to fees and expenses in unemployment insurance proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Senate | signed chap.331 |
2012-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1079 |
2012-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7520 |
2012-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.131 |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.131 |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S07520 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10238