NY A10133 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8790
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8790
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Waives the residency requirement for the information services director for Herkimer county by allowing a person holding such office to reside in a county adjoining Herkimer county.
Title
Waives the residency requirement for the information services director for Herkimer county by allowing a person holding such office to reside in a county adjoining Herkimer county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s8790 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.737 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08790 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.458